NY A01452 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the length of time to pay delinquent taxes in installments to thirty-six months.
Title
Expands the length of time to pay delinquent taxes in installments to thirty-six months.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.109 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.381 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |