NY A01450 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires mandatory arbitration clauses in certain consumer contracts to be disclosed and explained to the consumer.
Title
Requires mandatory arbitration clauses in certain consumer contracts to be disclosed and explained to the consumer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.74 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.78 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.78 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02748 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION