NY A01407 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - signed chap.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - signed chap.61
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to vacancies on boards of cooperative educational services.
Title
Relates to vacancies on boards of cooperative educational services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | signed chap.61 |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.806 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3014A |
2016-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.571 |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | print number 1407b |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | print number 1407a |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03014 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1407B