NY A01394 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires posting notice of the department of financial services toll free consumer's hot-line telephone number.
Title
Requires posting notice of the department of financial services toll free consumer's hot-line telephone number.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | print number 1394a |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to banks |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to banks |