NY A01390 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - substituted by s1160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - substituted by s1160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that school districts may hold elections in any building owned or leased by the district, in addition to any district schoolhouse.
Title
Provides that school districts may hold elections in any building owned or leased by the district, in addition to any district schoolhouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | substituted by s1160 |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.401 |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2023-01-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01160 (Same As) 2024-04-15 - returned to senate