NY A01382 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - substituted by s2318b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - substituted by s2318b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes emergency vehicles displaying certain flashing light color combinations in provisions of law that require operators of vehicles to exercise due care when approaching.
Title
Includes emergency vehicles displaying certain flashing light color combinations in provisions of law that require operators of vehicles to exercise due care when approaching.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s2318b |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.496 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | print number 1382b |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2013-04-05 | Assembly | print number 1382a |
2013-04-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02318 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.248