NY A01347 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - substituted by s910
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-18 - substituted by s910
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines the scope of responsibilities of the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services regarding recovery services for veterans.
Title
Defines the scope of responsibilities of the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services regarding recovery services for veterans.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Michael DenDekker [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] |
Asm. Claudia Tenney [R] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s910 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.296 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.296 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S00910 (Same As) 2013-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.358