NY A01287 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s3953b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s3953b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that no person operating or controlling any Class I railroad or Class II railroad shall allow the operation of any railroad train or locomotive for the movement of freight unless such railroad train or locomotive has a crew of not less than two individuals; provides exemptions; defines terms; imposes civil penalties.
Title
Provides that no person operating or controlling any Class I railroad or Class II railroad shall allow the operation of any railroad train or locomotive for the movement of freight unless such railroad train or locomotive has a crew of not less than two individuals; provides exemptions; defines terms; imposes civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted by s3953b |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.176 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.176 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 1287b |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | print number 1287a |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03953 (Same As) 2022-12-09 - VETOED MEMO.95