NY A01260 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the New York state innovation voucher program; provides small businesses with access to research and development by colleges and universities, government laboratories and public research institutes in order to assist such businesses in the creation of innovative products or services; makes an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the New York state innovation voucher program; provides small businesses with access to research and development by colleges and universities, government laboratories and public research institutes in order to assist such businesses in the creation of innovative products or services; makes an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1846
2017-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S817A
2017-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.369
2017-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.369
2017-06-15Assemblyreported
2017-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-05-19Assemblyprint number 1260a
2017-05-19Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2017-02-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-11Assemblyreferred to small business

Same As/Similar To

S00817 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1260A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01260&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01260&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01260
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01260&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01260A
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01260&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01260&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01260&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A1260#SF1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01260&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback