NY A01253 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - substituted by s900
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - substituted by s900
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the confidentiality of contact tracing information.
Title
Relates to the confidentiality of contact tracing information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Assembly | substituted by s900 |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.69 |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00900 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.62