NY A01245 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - signed chap.31
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - signed chap.31
Summary
This bill would require New York City to establish an emergency alert notification system at each of its public schools using a combination of text messages, emails and phone calls in order to provide staff, parents and the community notification and instructions in emergency situations occurring within public school buildings. The cost to establish such a system is minimal, particularly insofar as New York City has the poten- tial to plug into the existing NY-Alert system run by the New York State Emergency Management Office.
Title
Enacts the "public schools emergency alert act"; requires the chancellor of a city school district in a city with a population of one million or more to implement an emergency alert notification system in order to notify and advise parents or persons in parental relation, faculty, staff and elected representatives of incidents posing a threat to the health or safety of such persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | signed chap.31 | |
2009-05-07 | delivered to governor | |
2009-05-05 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-05-05 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-04-28 | 3RD READING CAL.210 | |
2009-04-28 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3254A | |
2009-03-23 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-03-23 | delivered to senate | |
2009-03-23 | passed assembly | |
2009-03-16 | amended on third reading 1245a | |
2009-02-19 | advanced to third reading cal.83 | |
2009-02-11 | reported | |
2009-02-04 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03254 (Same As) 2009-05-19 - signed chap.31
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01245&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |