NY A01236 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - substituted by s4844b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the rights of nursing employees to express breast milk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the rights of nursing employees to express breast milk.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-03Assemblysubstituted by s4844b
2022-04-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.521
2022-04-25Assemblyreported
2022-03-02Assemblyprint number 1236a
2022-03-02Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2021-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-04-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-01-07Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S04844 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A1236
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01236&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01236
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01236&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01236A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01236&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01236&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01236&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01236&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback