NY S04844 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands the rights of nursing employees to express breast milk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands the rights of nursing employees to express breast milk.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-05-03Assemblypassed assembly
2022-05-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.521
2022-05-03Assemblysubstituted for a1236a
2022-03-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2022-03-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-03-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-03-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2022-03-01Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2022-02-28Senate1ST REPORT CAL.556
2022-02-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 4844B
2022-02-24SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2022-01-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-01-05Assemblydied in assembly
2021-03-09Assemblyreferred to labor
2021-03-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-03-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-03-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-03-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-03-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.497
2021-02-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 4844A
2021-02-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2021-02-16SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A01236 (Same As) 2022-05-03 - substituted by s4844b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4844
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04844&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04844
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04844&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04844A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04844&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04844B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4844#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4844#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4844#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/S4844#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04844&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback