NY A01211 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s4448
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s4448
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Deerfield in Oneida county to transfer jurisdiction of a road to the state.
Title
Authorizes the town of Deerfield in Oneida county to transfer jurisdiction of a road to the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s4448 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.599 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | print number 1211a |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04448 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - SIGNED CHAP.767