NY A01211 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits correction officers to be color blind.
Title
Permits correction officers to be color blind.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Marcus Molinaro [R] |
Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. William Barclay [R] | Asm. Nancy Calhoun [R] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
Asm. Tony Jordan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in correction |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00474 (Same As) 2012-03-14 - referred to correction