NY A01200 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-11-22 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the people with disabilities access to programs commission to examine, evaluate and make recommendations for new laws with respect to how the state should streamline eligibility requirements and processes for its programs and services to assist people with disabilities.
Title
Establishes the people with disabilities access to programs commission to examine, evaluate and make recommendations for new laws with respect to how the state should streamline eligibility requirements and processes for its programs and services to assist people with disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-11-22 | Assembly | tabled |
2024-11-22 | Assembly | vetoed memo.18 |
2024-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1551 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S413 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.37 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.192 |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S00413 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1200