NY A01198 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5998
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5998
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to disaster preparedness.
Title
Relates to disaster preparedness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5998 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.427 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05998 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - VETOED MEMO.169