NY A01178 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to mandatory health insurance coverage for providing prosthetic devices.
Title
Relates to mandatory health insurance coverage for providing prosthetic devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.223 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.223 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to insurance |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1178c |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.54 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.323 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.323 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 1178b |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | print number 1178a |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01708 (Same As) 2016-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 1708C