NY A01157 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires semiautomatic pistols manufactured or delivered to any licensed dealer in this state to be capable of microstamping ammunition; establishes fines for violations of this requirement and provides for an affirmative defense if the dealer had a certification from the manufacturer.
Title
Requires semiautomatic pistols manufactured or delivered to any licensed dealer in this state to be capable of microstamping ammunition; establishes fines for violations of this requirement and provides for an affirmative defense if the dealer had a certification from the manufacturer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1157b |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.63 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1157a |
2011-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.241 |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00675 (Same As) 2012-03-14 - PRINT NUMBER 675C