NY A01153 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-11 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the categories of policies classified as blanket accident policies.
Title
Expands the categories of policies classified as blanket accident policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | Senate | tabled |
2015-12-11 | Senate | vetoed memo.277 |
2015-11-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1761B |
2015-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.58 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.58 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | print number 1153a |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01761 (Same As) 2015-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1153A