NY A01085 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s7074a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s7074a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the monetary exclusion on the requirement of plain language in consumer contracts.
Title
Increases the monetary exclusion on the requirement of plain language in consumer contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] |
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Latoya Joyner [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Dov Hikind [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable Correction Date:01/27/2017 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable Correction Date:01/27/2017 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s7074a |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1085a |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-12 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.75 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.13 |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.13 |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |