NY A01052 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to design professional service corporations; authorizes certain existing professional service corporations to become a design professional service corporation where such corporation meets requirements and amends its certificate of incorporation.
Title
Relates to design professional service corporations; authorizes certain existing professional service corporations to become a design professional service corporation where such corporation meets requirements and amends its certificate of incorporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | signed chap.9 |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-02-27 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-02-27 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.31 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2898 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.9 |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.9 |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02898 (Same As) 2013-02-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1052