NY A01034 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides exemptions from certain requirements for electronic prescriptions for oral prescriptions issued to patients in health care facilities, nursing homes and residential care facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides exemptions from certain requirements for electronic prescriptions for oral prescriptions issued to patients in health care facilities, nursing homes and residential care facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-18Senate3RD READING CAL.295
2019-03-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4183
2019-02-28SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-02-28Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-28Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-11Assemblyamended on third reading 1034a
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.20
2019-01-29Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04183 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1034A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01034&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01034&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01034
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01034&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01034A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01034&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01034&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1034#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback