NY A01005 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - signed chap.586
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - signed chap.586
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing information about extreme risk protection orders upon conditional release or discharge of patients to the community; allows information to be provided to the patient or, upon consent of the patient, to an authorized representative who has actively participated in the patient's treatment plan, if the director of the facility and such facility's clinical staff who worked directly with the patient determine through an evaluation and assessment, that there is the presence of a mental health diagnosis or symptoms of a mental illness exhibited by the patient, which indicates the patient may be at substantial risk of physical harm to himself or herself, or has made threats of or attempts at suicide.
Title
Relates to providing information about extreme risk protection orders upon conditional release or discharge of patients to the community; allows information to be provided to the patient or, upon consent of the patient, to an authorized representative who has actively participated in the patient's treatment plan, if the director of the facility and such facility's clinical staff who worked directly with the patient determine through an evaluation and assessment, that there is the presence of a mental health diagnosis or symptoms of a mental illness exhibited by the patient, which indicates the patient may be at substantial risk of physical harm to himself or herself, or has made threats of or attempts at suicide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | signed chap.586 |
2021-10-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.844 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5434A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.412 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.412 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | print number 1005a |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to mental health |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05434 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1005A