NY A01000 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.43
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes clarifications to the provisions of the warehouse worker protection act.
Title
Makes clarifications to the provisions of the warehouse worker protection act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Assembly | signed chap.43 |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-01-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.60 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S851 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.50 |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.50 |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00851 (Same As) 2023-01-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1000