NY A00969 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - signed chap.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - signed chap.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires consent of the cemetery board in the department of state prior to the merger of cemetery corporation; sets requirements for merger of consolidation.
Title
Requires consent of the cemetery board in the department of state prior to the merger of cemetery corporation; sets requirements for merger of consolidation.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Assembly | signed chap.8 |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-01-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.49 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S896 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.7 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00896 (Same As) 2021-01-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A969