NY A00964 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-10)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-12 - print number 964a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the clean fuel standard of 2024; provides such standard is intended to reduce carbon intensity from the on-road transportation sector by 30% by 2032, with further reductions to be implemented based upon advances in technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the clean fuel standard of 2024; provides such standard is intended to reduce carbon intensity from the on-road transportation sector by 30% by 2032, with further reductions to be implemented based upon advances in technology.

Sponsors

Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]
Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]
Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]
Asm. Jonathan Rivera [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. David Weprin [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]
Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]
Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Chantel Jackson [D]Asm. Christopher Burdick [D]
Asm. Khaleel Anderson [D]Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D]
Asm. Sarah Clark [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Jenifer Rajkumar [D]Asm. Matthew Simpson [R]Asm. Edward Ra [R]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Keith Brown [R]
Asm. Michael Durso [R]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D]
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. William Conrad [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Eddie Gibbs [D]
Asm. John Mikulin [R]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Alex Bores [D]Asm. Steven Raga [D]
Asm. Juan Ardila [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Maryjane Shimsky [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Manny De Los Santos [D]Asm. Jarett Gandolfo [R]Asm. Brian Cunningham [D]
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Grace Lee [D]Asm. Tony Simone [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D]Asm. Christopher Eachus [D]Asm. Dana Levenberg [D]Asm. Gina Sillitti [D]
Asm. Michael Novakhov [R]Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Amanda Septimo [D]
Asm. John Zaccaro [D]Asm. Demond Meeks [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]
Asm. Matthew Slater [R]Asm. Scott Bendett [R]Asm. George Alvarez [D]Asm. Taylor Darling [D]
Asm. Monique Chandler-Waterman [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-12Assemblyprint number 964a
2024-01-12Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2023-01-11Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S01292 (Same As) 2024-05-21 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback