NY A00937 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - held for consideration in correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts, upon notification from law enforcement agencies, to notify persons in parental relation to its students, of level two and three sex offenders living in the district; apportions money to school districts for certain sex offender expenses.
Title
Requires school districts, upon notification from law enforcement agencies, to notify persons in parental relation to its students, of level two and three sex offenders living in the district; apportions money to school districts for certain sex offender expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | held for consideration in correction |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01599 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES