NY A00911 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.688
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.688
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to operating a vessel while intoxicated when a child who is fifteen years of age or less is a passenger in such vessel.
Title
Relates to operating a vessel while intoxicated when a child who is fifteen years of age or less is a passenger in such vessel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | signed chap.688 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1670 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S947A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.516 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.516 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-04-01 | Assembly | print number 911a |
2022-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00947 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A911A