NY A00894 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - signed chap.497
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - signed chap.497
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires assessors using the comparable sales, income capitalization or cost method for assessments to consider certain comparable properties in formulating the assessment of non-residential properties.
Title
Requires assessors using the comparable sales, income capitalization or cost method for assessments to consider certain comparable properties in formulating the assessment of non-residential properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Assembly | signed chap.497 |
2021-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.757 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5715A |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.160 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.160 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 894c |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | print number 894b |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | print number 894a |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05715 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A894C