NY A00881 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of educational materials regarding the misuse of and addiction to prescription drugs.
Title
Relates to the distribution of educational materials regarding the misuse of and addiction to prescription drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND DRUG ABUSE |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.113 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.113 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S08080 (Same As) 2016-06-10 - REFERRED TO RULES