NY A00873 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the state office of mental health is directed to make available, at no cost to the county, a qualified physician for the purpose of examination of persons ordered to obtain assisted outpatient treatment in certain counties.
Title
Provides that the state office of mental health is directed to make available, at no cost to the county, a qualified physician for the purpose of examination of persons ordered to obtain assisted outpatient treatment in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05245 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES