NY A00862 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes in a city with a population of one million or more a bus rapid transit and bus mobility demonstration program to enforce certain restrictions on the use of bus lanes by means of bus lane photo devices.
Title
Establishes in a city with a population of one million or more a bus rapid transit and bus mobility demonstration program to enforce certain restrictions on the use of bus lanes by means of bus lane photo devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to transportation | |
2009-05-20 | print number 862c | |
2009-05-20 | amend and recommit to transportation | |
2009-04-30 | print number 862b | |
2009-04-30 | amend and recommit to transportation | |
2009-02-10 | print number 862a | |
2009-02-10 | amend and recommit to transportation | |
2009-01-07 | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2709-D (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION