NY A00853 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - print number 853b
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-27 - print number 853b
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a bankruptcy exemption for rent regulated tenancies.
Title
Relates to a bankruptcy exemption for rent regulated tenancies.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. James Brennan [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Addie Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-27 | Assembly | print number 853b |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2013-12-23 | Assembly | print number 853a |
2013-12-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |