NY A00730 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-01 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of environmental conservation to require, as a condition precedent to the issuance or renewal of a major facility license, the submission of satisfactory evidence that the applicant has implemented, or is in the process of implementing, state and federal plans and regulations for the prompt detection of petroleum discharges; requires applicants for a major facility license to submit information, in form satisfactory to the commissioner, describing the equipment used at the facility to promptly detect petroleum discharges; requires major facilities to install equipment to promptly detect discharges of petroleum from a tank and any connected petroleum pipelines within one year of effective date; defines "prompt detection".
Title
Requires the department of environmental conservation to require, as a condition precedent to the issuance or renewal of a major facility license, the submission of satisfactory evidence that the applicant has implemented, or is in the process of implementing, state and federal plans and regulations for the prompt detection of petroleum discharges; requires applicants for a major facility license to submit information, in form satisfactory to the commissioner, describing the equipment used at the facility to promptly detect petroleum discharges; requires major facilities to install equipment to promptly detect discharges of petroleum from a tank and any connected petroleum pipelines within one year of effective date; defines "prompt detection".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.736 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |