NY A00723 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - advanced to third reading cal.353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - advanced to third reading cal.353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits insurers from refusing to issue or renew, cancel, or charge or impose an increased premium for homeowners' insurance policies based on the breed of a dog owned.
Title
Prohibits insurers from refusing to issue or renew, cancel, or charge or impose an increased premium for homeowners' insurance policies based on the breed of a dog owned.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.353 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04286 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07924 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
S07924 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE