NY A00723 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - advanced to third reading cal.498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - advanced to third reading cal.498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in cities with a population of one million or more, the rent following the dissolution date of Mitchell-Lama developments shall be the last rent authorized for the affected dwelling.
Title
Provides that in cities with a population of one million or more, the rent following the dissolution date of Mitchell-Lama developments shall be the last rent authorized for the affected dwelling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.498 |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.51 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.51 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to housing |