NY A00715 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain licensed health service professionals to form limited liability companies.
Title
Authorizes certain licensed health service professionals to form limited liability companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | print number 715a |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05581 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - PRINT NUMBER 5581A