NY A00684 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s6161a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s6161a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning licensure, limits on fees and interest and disclosure practices of businesses engaged in pension loan advancements.
Title
Directs the department of financial services to study, evaluate and make recommendations concerning licensure, limits on fees and interest and disclosure practices of businesses engaged in pension loan advancements.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6161a |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 684a |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-12 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2017-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.315 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S06161 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - APPROVAL MEMO.29