NY A00653 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - print number 653a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-22 - print number 653a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the non-partisan legislative budget office; directs such office shall provide information to legislative committees of the senate and assembly with respect to the state budget, appropriation bills and other bills providing budget authority or tax expenditures; requires such office to report to the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.
Title
Creates the non-partisan legislative budget office; directs such office shall provide information to legislative committees of the senate and assembly with respect to the state budget, appropriation bills and other bills providing budget authority or tax expenditures; requires such office to report to the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | print number 653a | |
2010-06-22 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental operations | |
2009-01-07 | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S4526 (Same As) 2010-06-21 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4526A