NY A00643 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.52
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires courts, prior to accepting a plea to a misdemeanor or violation, to provide notice to the defendant that such plea and the acceptance thereof could result in deportation, removal from the United States, exclusion from the United States or denial of citizenship, if the defendant is not a citizen of the United States.
Title
Requires courts, prior to accepting a plea to a misdemeanor or violation, to provide notice to the defendant that such plea and the acceptance thereof could result in deportation, removal from the United States, exclusion from the United States or denial of citizenship, if the defendant is not a citizen of the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.52 |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.26 |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |