NY A00625 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts hot tubs or spas with safety covers from certain standards of the New York state uniform fire prevention and building code.
Title
Exempts hot tubs or spas with safety covers from certain standards of the New York state uniform fire prevention and building code.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Assembly | signed chap.18 |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-01-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.115 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1347 |
2023-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.29 |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.29 |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01347 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A625