NY A00614 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.899
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.899
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the rights to contract for the burial of cremains in pet cemeteries; requires notice relating thereto.
Title
Relates to the rights to contract for the burial of cremains in pet cemeteries; requires notice relating thereto.
Sponsors
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.899 |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | print number 614a |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |