NY A00586 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - substituted by s126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - substituted by s126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the education and experience of members of the state board of parole; provides that members can have either a degree and at least five years of experience in several fields or at least ten years of experience in such fields.
Title
Relates to the education and experience of members of the state board of parole; provides that members can have either a degree and at least five years of experience in several fields or at least ten years of experience in such fields.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] |
Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s126 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.90 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.90 |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00126 (Same As) 2024-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.499