NY A00494 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for trichloroethylene (TCE) exposure prevention; directs the department of health to prescribe a maximum indoor air contaminant level for trichloroethylene, for such standard, the targeted risk of residual contamination shall be based on the most protective underlying assumptions and cancer potency factor and shall not exceed an excess cancer risk of one in one-million for carcinogenic end points and a hazard index of one for non-cancer end points, in order to minimize health risks associated to exposure to trichloroethylene.
Title
Provides for trichloroethylene (TCE) exposure prevention; directs the department of health to prescribe a maximum indoor air contaminant level for trichloroethylene, for such standard, the targeted risk of residual contamination shall be based on the most protective underlying assumptions and cancer potency factor and shall not exceed an excess cancer risk of one in one-million for carcinogenic end points and a hazard index of one for non-cancer end points, in order to minimize health risks associated to exposure to trichloroethylene.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00495 (Same As) 2017-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH