NY A00486 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-15)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s438a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s438a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of distinctive plates for members of Kiwanis International.
Title
Authorizes the issuance of distinctive plates for members of Kiwanis International.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s438a |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.636 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | print number 486a |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00438 (Same As) 2015-10-26 - VETOED MEMO.212