NY A00474 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - print number 474b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - print number 474b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals to establish a violence prevention program and conduct an annual safety and security assessment for the purpose of protecting health care workers, patients, families and visitors.
Title
Requires hospitals to establish a violence prevention program and conduct an annual safety and security assessment for the purpose of protecting health care workers, patients, families and visitors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Assembly | print number 474b |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2024-02-02 | Assembly | print number 474a |
2024-02-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04909 (Same As) 2024-04-19 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING