NY A00471 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s784b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s784b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain vehicle equipment violations and fines.
Title
Relates to certain vehicle equipment violations and fines.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s784b |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.697 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.697 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-05 | Assembly | print number 471c |
2021-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 471b |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | print number 471a |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00784 (Same As) 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.527