NY A00466 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-12 - amended on third reading 466b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-12 - amended on third reading 466b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to conduct a legal review for the re-designation of Donald J. Trump State Park, in Putnam and Westchester counties to a new name.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to conduct a legal review for the re-designation of Donald J. Trump State Park, in Putnam and Westchester counties to a new name.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Assembly | amended on third reading 466b |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.33 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 466a |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.93 |
2021-02-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S00991 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 991D