NY S00991 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 991D
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - PRINT NUMBER 991D
Pending: Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to conduct a legal review for the re-designation of Donald J. Trump State Park, in Putnam and Westchester counties to a new name.
Title
Directs the commissioner of the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to conduct a legal review for the re-designation of Donald J. Trump State Park, in Putnam and Westchester counties to a new name.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Elijah Reichlin-Melnick [D] | Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 991D |
2022-01-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2021-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 991C |
2021-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.499 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 991B |
2021-02-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2021-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 991A |
2021-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00466 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - amended on third reading 466b